U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00028-3
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WALKER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2019: [Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Information on Prior Convictions]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reveal the Deal]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Additional Motions]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 27, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.