U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00030-11
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WATKINS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reveal the Deal]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reveal the Deal]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 03, 2020: [Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
  • January 06, 2020: [Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Voir Dire Policy]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 12, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 18, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Joint Motion]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Joint Motion]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 02, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 01, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order of Detention]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.