U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COCHRAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 12, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.