U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:97-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Juma
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion Rule 60(b) Relief from Judgment or Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.