U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ROHRBACH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 17, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.