U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00042-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JONES et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 17, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.