U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00044-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GLASS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
  • November 01, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.