U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MOORE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond Forfeiture]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Joint Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 15, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.