U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DONALD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 23, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.