U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JONES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.