U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WRENN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Court Verdict]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 28, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.