U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:13-cr-00001-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JEUDY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.