U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 28, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.