U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MULLINS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.