U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. VASQUEZ-ALCANTARA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 29, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.