U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00002-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SILVERIO et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 26, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 30, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.