U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BERG et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 05, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 11, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.