U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HUGHES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 15, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.