U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DENNIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order of Dismissal]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order of Commitment]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 23, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.