U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GONZALEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 28, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.