U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-mj-00012-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ODOM
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • August 01, 2019: [Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.