U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RAINES et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.