U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALEXANDER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 23, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.