U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCCRORY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
  • January 02, 2020: [Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.