U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BYRON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 02, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.