U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:97-cr-00016-3
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Gaines et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - FIRST STEP ACT]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.