U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JACKSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.