U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILCOX
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.