U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. REYNOLDS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 13, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.