U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ORDAZ AVALOS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 23, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 05, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 04, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.