U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. EVANS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 04, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
  • April 11, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.