U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JUSTICE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.