U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00019-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MATHIS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 08, 2025: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 03, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.