U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00009-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRANTLEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 06, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.