U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TYNDALL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order]
  • June 13, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.