U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-mj-00059-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BAKER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.