U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUFFY et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 07, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • June 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 05, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order of Detention]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • January 17, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 12, 2020: [Order]
  • January 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • October 09, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 18, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 17, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.