U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MIGUEL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order]
  • May 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.