open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-10735
    Party Name:Harry J. Bridges and Debra A. Bridges
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Installment Payment/Filing Fee Paid in Full]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Continued without follow-up]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Court's Notice of Deficient Filings]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?387296
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =