open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-10734
    Party Name:Ryan A. Ramsey
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held-Plan Confirmed (Terminate Hearings)]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Installment Payment/Filing Fee Paid in Full]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Installment Payment]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?387291
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =