open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-51277
    Party Name:Robin L Davis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Trustee)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Continued without follow-up]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Installment Payment/Filing Fee Paid in Full]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Installment Payment]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?387290
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =