U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WEAVER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 05, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 13, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.