U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WASHINGTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 08, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 25, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.