U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SORROW
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 10, 2019: [Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 06, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.