U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JACKSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.