U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BOOZE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.