U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ELIAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.