U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DUNLAP
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 05, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.