U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:19-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COLEMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.