U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SHULTS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 23, 2020: [Terminate Motions]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 02, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.